Lunsford v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Roger Keith Lunsford
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice and United States Attorneys Office
Case Number: 3:2021cv00289
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Keith Lunsford. Federal Bureau of Investigation(Charlotte, North Carolina Field Office) served on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021 (js)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Keith Lunsford. United States Attorneys Office served on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (js)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Keith Lunsford. Federal Bureau of Investigation(Greensboro, North Carolina Field Office) served on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (js)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Keith Lunsford. United States Department of Justice served on 6/22/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (js) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/1/2021) (js).
June 25, 2021 Acknowledged receipt of electronically transferred case by USDC Middle District of North Carolina, their civil action no. 1:21-cv-00523. (rth)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint: Plaintiff's action is transferred to the Middle District of North Carolina. The Clerk is instructed to terminate this action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/24/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
June 25, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of Middle District of North Carolina. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (kby)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Frank G. Johns, Clerk of Court on June 17, 2021 re #1 Complaint. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(dgr)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Federal Bureau of Investigation (Charlotte, North Carolina Field Office), Federal Bureau of Investigation (Greensboro, North Carolina Field Office), United States Attorneys Office, and United States Department of Justice. (dgr)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT filed by Roger Keith Lunsford against Federal Bureau of Investigation (Charlotte, North Carolina Field Office), Federal Bureau of Investigation (Greensboro, North Carolina Field Office), United States Attorneys Office, United States Department of Justice. Filing fee $402 receipt number CHD066068. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Summons)(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lunsford v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Keith Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?