Alexander Chase CondominiumAssociation, Inc. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alexander Chase Condominium Association, Inc.
Defendant: Philadephia Indemnity Insurance Company and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00317
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Five (5) days. Discovery due by 3/31/2022. Motions due by 5/2/2022. Mediation deadline set for 11/30/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom #8, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/26/2021. (eef)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Jessup, Robert)
August 13, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/3/2021. (eef)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Brown, David)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Brown, David)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Leonard Brown on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Brown, David)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (kab) Modified docket text on 7/2/2021 (kab).
July 2, 2021 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kab)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexander Chase Condominium Association, Inc. (Jessup, Robert)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5100488), filed by Alexander Chase Condominium Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Letter October 21, #3 Exhibit February 3, 2021 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit June 4, 2021 Correspondence)(Jessup, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander Chase CondominiumAssociation, Inc. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Chase Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Henry Jessup, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadephia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: David Leonard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?