Hernandez v. State of N.C.
Petitioner: Fernando Hernandez
Respondent: State of N.C.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00359
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 Pro Se MOTION for the Court to take Judicial Notice from Fernando Hernandez (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) Modified to correct event on 8/2/2021 (js).
July 28, 2021 Filing Fee Received: $ 5.00, receipt number CHD066684 (js)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:21-hc-02138. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - the court ORDERS the clerk to TRANSFER Hernandez's petition to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina, the district where venue is proper. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/21/2021. Copy sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/22/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. (rth)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 CORRECTED PETITION (on the form) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fernando Hernandez. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/22/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for petition review. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/22/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fernando Hernandez. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/22/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 Document in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fernando Hernandez. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/22/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The petition is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court AND the filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Responses due by 7/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/28/2021. Copy of order and forms sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/22/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Fernando Hernandez at Franklin Correctional Center. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/22/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fernando Hernandez. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. State of N.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fernando Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of N.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?