Carmona v. Union County Sheriffs Office et al
Plaintiff: Jason Carmona
Defendant: Union County Sheriffs Office, Union County Jail, FNU Martin, FNU Younts, Union County Narcotics and Union County Courts
Case Number: 3:2021cv00366
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Pltf's pro se Letters [Docs. #7 , #9 , #10 , #11 ] are construed as Motions and are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, in that Pltf shall have 30 days in which to file a superseding Second Amended Complaint in accordance with the terms of this Order. If Pltf fails to amend the Complaint in accordance with this Order and within the time limit set by the Court, this action will proceed on the Amended Complaint [Doc. #6 ]. Pltf's remaining Letters [Docs. #4 , #5 , #13 , #14 ] are construed as Motions seeking miscellaneous relief and are DENIED. Pltf is cautioned that future duplicative or abusive filings will be stricken without further notice. (Secord Amended Complaint due by 10/18/2021.) Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/17/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 Pro Se Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Jason Carmona (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 Pro Se Letter from Jason Carmona (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 Pro Se MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint to correct the list of defendants by Jason Carmona. Responses due by 8/26/2021 (eef)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 Pro Se Addendum by Jason Carmona. Addendum to #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(js)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Pro Se Letter from Jason Carmona (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #6 Amended Complaint by Jason Carmona (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION to Participate in the Pro Se Settlement Assistance Program by Jason Carmona. Responses due by 8/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (eef)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jason Carmona. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Se Letter from Jason Carmona (A new 1983 complaint was sent to Plaintiff for an Amended Complaint). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Se Addendum by Jason Carmona in re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Frank G. Johns, Clerk of Court on 07/23/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(js)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Jason Carmona (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/23/2021) (js).
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jason Carmona. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2021: #2 Summons) (js).
July 23, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger (js) Modified to correct extra wording on 8/9/2021 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmona v. Union County Sheriffs Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Carmona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union County Sheriffs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Younts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union County Narcotics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union County Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?