Haggins v. Overturf et al
Plaintiff: Mary Haggins
Defendant: Lee Overturf, Richard William, FNU LNU and Car 396
Case Number: 3:2021cv00370
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/21/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/21/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice as to Plaintiff paying the filing fee or filing an amended Application within 14 days of this Order. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/2/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
September 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended IFP Application or Filing Fee due by 9/16/2021. (brl)
July 28, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mary Haggins. (js)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mary Haggins. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haggins v. Overturf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Haggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Overturf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car 396
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?