Holly Park Townhome Association, Inc. v. Main Street America Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Holly Park Townhome Association, Inc.
Defendant: Main Street America Assurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00400
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: five days. Discovery due by 3/31/2022. Motions due by 5/2/2022. Mediation deadline set for 4/14/2022. Ready Date for Trial set for 10/17/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/31/2021. (mek)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Jessup, Robert)
August 11, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/1/2021. (ams)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal,, by Main Street America Assurance Company.(Thornton, Rebecca)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Main Street America Assurance Company (Thornton, Rebecca)
August 4, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(dgr)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Ann Thornton on behalf of Main Street America Assurance Company (Thornton, Rebecca)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Union County Superior Court, case number 21-CVS-1865 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5148165), filed by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Complaint, #7 Exhibit F to Complaint, #8 Exhibit G to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 2- Notice of Removal)(Thornton, Rebecca) Modified on 8/4/2021 to remove duplicative wording (dgr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holly Park Townhome Association, Inc. v. Main Street America Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Park Townhome Association, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Henry Jessup, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street America Assurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?