United States of America v. Approximately $11,854 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $11,854 in United States Currency and Approximately $9,500 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2021cv00404
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 09/05/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service (Direct Notice) by United States of America re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Department of the Treasury Process Receipt and Return re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, filed by United States of America. (Johnson, J.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property. Signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns on 08/06/2021. (dgr)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Approximately $11,854 in United States Currency, Approximately $9,500 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America.(Johnson, J.)
August 5, 2021 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $11,854 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J. Seth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $11,854 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $9,500 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?