Adams v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Arthur Adams
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00433
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Niland, Ryan)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Hunter Niland on behalf of Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Niland, Ryan)
October 6, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/25/2021. (ef)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America.(Saluta, Gemma)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America answer due 10/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/8/21. (mga)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Saluta, Gemma). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (kab)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guardian Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5172282), filed by Arthur Adams. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Peace, John) Modified text on 8/18/2021 (kab).
August 18, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kab)
August 18, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (kab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Adams
Represented By: John Robert Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Gemma Lillian Saluta
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?