Amos v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Douglas Michael Amos
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv00442
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS as to Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administration served on 9/3/2021. (js)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS as to Commissioner of Social Security. US Attorney General served on 9/8/2021. (js)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT DELETED - DUPLICATE ENTRY (See Doc. 6) (Modified text on 9/28/2021.) NEF Regenerated. (khm)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS as to Commissioner of Social Security. US Attorney served on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (js)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay F. Osterhout on behalf of Douglas Michael Amos (Osterhout, Lindsay) Modified to reflect correct filer on 9/9/2021 (js).
August 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 USM-285s)(khm)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk to issue summons to U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/27/2021. (khm)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Douglas Michael Amos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hall, Charles) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/25/2021 with complete .pdf). NEF Regenerated. (ejb).
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Douglas Michael Amos. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hall, Charles)
August 23, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amos v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Michael Amos
Represented By: Charles Frederick Hall, IV
Represented By: Lindsay F. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?