Premier, Inc. et al v. The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC
Plaintiff: Premier, Inc., Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP and Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00462
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The #9 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED and the #8 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Appoint Counsel for Defendant is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/28/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time by Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP, Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Premier, Inc.. Responses due by 10/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Proposed Order) (Wilson, J.) Motion referred to David S. Cayer. Modified to add magistrate referral on 10/12/2021 (clc).
October 12, 2021 Motion referred to David S. Cayer #9 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time (clc)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION to Dismiss re #1 COMPLAINT by The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (js) Modified to add relationship on 9/28/2021 (js).
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Premier, Inc., Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP. The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Wilson, J.)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (eef)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc. (Wilson, J.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (eef)
September 3, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP (Wilson, J.)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier, Inc. (Wilson, J.)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5201902), filed by Premier, Inc., Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '964, '034, '211 Registrations, #2 Exhibit B - PREMIER-Formative Registrations, #3 Exhibit C - SEC Filing, #4 Exhibit D - 7.21.21 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - 7.30.21 Letter, #6 Exhibit F - 8.6.21 Letter)(Wilson, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier, Inc. et al v. The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier, Inc.
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Healthcare Alliance, LP
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Premier Healthcare Solution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?