Semafone Limited, et al v. PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc.
Plaintiff: Semafone Limited and Semafone, Inc.
Defendant: PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00486
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US7113580 B1)(Morrow, John)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc.. Responses due by 11/19/2021 (Morrow, John)
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrow, John). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc. (Morrow, John)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Morrow, Jr on behalf of PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc. (Morrow, John)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint . PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc. answer due 11/5/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/30/2021. (KCA)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Semafone Limited, Semafone, Inc.. PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc. served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Adams, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Daniel J. Schwartz for Semafone Limited; and granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew W. Werber for Semafone, Inc.(Pro Hac Vice Attorneys served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/15/2021. (mek)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew W. Werber Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5219081. by Semafone Limited, Semafone, Inc.. (Adams, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel J. Schwartz Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5219071. by Semafone Limited, Semafone, Inc.. (Adams, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(dgr)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (dgr)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Semafone, Inc. (Adams, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Semafone Limited (Adams, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5218981), filed by Semafone Limited, Semafone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Adams, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(dgr)
September 15, 2021 Notice to Daniel J. Schwartz: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Link Existing Account and Update Account Information #Here. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 9/22/2021. (mek)
September 15, 2021 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to David S. Cayer: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew W. Werber Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5219081., #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel J. Schwartz Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5219071. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
September 15, 2021 Notice to Matthew Werber: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 9/22/2021. (mek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Semafone Limited, et al v. PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semafone Limited
Represented By: Daniel J. Schwartz
Represented By: Matthew W. Werber
Represented By: Nicholas H Lee
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Represented By: Matthew A. Werber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semafone, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Schwartz
Represented By: Matthew W. Werber
Represented By: Nicholas H Lee
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Represented By: Matthew A. Werber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCI Pal (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: John F. Morrow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?