A-76 Technologies, Inc. v. Mass Management, LLC
Plaintiff: A-76 Technologies, Inc. doing business as Aidant Brands
Defendant: Mass Management, LLC
Counter Defendant: A-76 Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00496
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 42 ANSWER to #34 Amended Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against A-76 Technologies, Inc. by Mass Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. NanoJTech - A-76 License Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2. NanoJTech - A-76 Agreement Amendment 1, #3 Exhibit 3. NanoJTech - A-76 Agreement Amendment 2, #4 Exhibit 4. A-76 Trademark Application, #5 Exhibit 5. RUST PATROL Trademark Application, #6 Exhibit 6. RESISTING ARRUST Trademark Application, #7 Exhibit 7. MASS - Aidant Agreement)(Trimmer, Christina)
November 8, 2021 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mass Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. NanoJTech - A-76 License Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2. Copyright Office Circular 66, #3 Exhibit 3. Public Catalog Rust Patrol Website, #4 Exhibit 4. Rust Patrol FAQ Copyright Registration)(Trimmer, Christina)
November 8, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mass Management, LLC. Responses due by 11/22/2021 (Trimmer, Christina)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/4/2021. (mek)
November 3, 2021 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Mass Management, LLC. Responses due by 11/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Trimmer, Christina). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 1 - 2 weeks. Discovery due by 5/5/2022. Motions due by 6/2/2022. Mediation deadline set for 5/19/2022. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 09:01 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/22/21. (clc)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #34 Amended Complaint. Mass Management, LLC answer due 11/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/20/2021. (mek)
October 20, 2021 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #34 Amended Complaint,, by Mass Management, LLC. (Trimmer, Christina). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 18, 2021 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mass Management, LLC, filed by A-76 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Plaintiff First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-Distribution & Marketing Agreement, #3 Exhibit B-Rust Patrol TM Registration, #4 Exhibit C-Resisting Arrust TM Registration, #5 Exhibit D-Rust Patrol Cert of Copyright, #6 Exhibit E-Rust Patrol Fact Sheet Cert of Copyright, #7 Exhibit F-Rick's Thunderbird Restoriation Cert of Copyright)(Hubbard, Kristine)
October 11, 2021 Filing 33 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Hubbard, Kristine)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #30 MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed) as set forth herein. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/6/2021. (ef)
October 6, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas D. Garber on behalf of Mass Management, LLC (Garber, Lucas)
October 5, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed) by Mass Management, LLC. Responses due by 10/19/2021 (Trimmer, Christina)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kristine Bancroft Hubbard for A-76 Technologies, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/30/2021. (brl)
September 30, 2021 Notice to Kristine Hubbard: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/7/2021. (brl)
September 29, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kristine B. Hubbard Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5245992. by A-76 Technologies, Inc.. (Moss, Joseph). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 29, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Moss, Jr on behalf of A-76 Technologies, Inc. (Moss, Joseph)
September 29, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Shannon Zmud Teicher as counsel by Mass Management, LLC (Trimmer, Christina)
September 22, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (rth)
September 22, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/12/2021. (rth)
September 22, 2021 Notice to Kristine Bancroft Hubbard, Shannon Melissa Zmud Teicher: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 9/29/2021. (rth)
September 21, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
September 21, 2021 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00923. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; granting #16 Motion to Transfer Venue, denying without prejudice #16 Motion for Dismissal. This case is transferred to the US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina, Charlotte Division..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY in Support of #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Transfer Venue Under Section 1404(a), filed by Mass Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael McGinnis)(Teicher, Shannon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 22 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Transfer Venue Under Section 1404(a), filed by A-76 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Hubbard, Kristine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Transfer Venue Under Section 1404(a) filed by A-76 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hubbard, Kristine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY in Support of #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by A-76 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Lauren Miller Supplemental Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hubbard, Kristine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by A-76 Technologies, Inc., filed.(Hubbard, Kristine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mass Management, LLC, filed.(Teicher, Shannon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Mass Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of James Tour, #2 Exhibit A - Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Amendment, #4 Exhibit C - Second Amendment, #5 Exhibit D - Term Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Letter, #7 Exhibit F - UCC Statement, #8 Exhibit G - Notice, #9 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michael McGinnis, #10 Exhibit H - Agreement, #11 Exhibit I - Email, #12 Exhibit J - Email, #13 Exhibit K - Email, #14 Exhibit L - Letter, #15 Exhibit M - Letter, #16 Exhibit N - TESS, #17 Proposed Order)(Teicher, Shannon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Transfer Venue Under Section 1404(a) by Mass Management, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Teicher, Shannon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant MASS Management LLC's deadline to respond to both the Complaint [#1] and Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [# 7] is hereby extended to and including May 10, 2021.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Samuel A. Long, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Christina Davidson Trimmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Christina Davidson Trimmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mass Management, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2021. (Teicher, Shannon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Samuel A. Long, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mass Management, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2021. (Teicher, Shannon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Mass Management, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Teicher, Shannon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mass Management, LLC, filed.(Teicher, Shannon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Mass Management, LLC served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021, filed.(Hubbard, Kristine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by A-76 Technologies, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Kristine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mass Management, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Mass Management, LLC, filed.(Hubbard, Kristine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Summons Not Issued as to Mass Management, LLC due to these deficiencies: Party named on summons is not a named defendant on the case. The c/o must go under the defendant's name. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Mass Management, LLC, filed.(Hubbard, Kristine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A-76 Technologies, Inc. d/b/a Aidan Brands (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26144137) filed by A-76 Technologies, Inc. d/b/a Aidan Brands. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hubbard, Kristine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 9/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A-76 Technologies, Inc. v. Mass Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A-76 Technologies, Inc. doing business as Aidant Brands
Represented By: Kristine Bancroft Hubbard
Represented By: Joseph W. Moss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mass Management, LLC
Represented By: Christina Davidson Trimmer
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Long, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon Melissa Zmud Teicher
Represented By: Lucas D. Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: A-76 Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W. Moss, Jr.
Represented By: Kristine Bancroft Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?