Bogle v. JD Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Bogle
Defendant: JD Technologies, Inc. and Radiator Specialty Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00507
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 Motion to Dismiss by Radiator Specialty Company, Inc.. (Trischler, Clem)
November 9, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION for Hearing re #59 MOTION for Hearing re #47 Rule 12i Motion to Dismiss by Radiator Specialty Company, Inc.. Responses due by 11/23/2021 (Garofalo, Mel)
November 9, 2021 Filing 65 ANSWER to #60 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim (Answer to Crossclaim of JDS Technologies, Inc.) by Radiator Specialty Company, Inc..(Garofalo, Mel)
November 9, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 11/29/2021. (clc)
November 8, 2021 Filing 64 ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against JD Technologies, Inc. by Radiator Specialty Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Crossclaim - Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit B to Crossclaim - Purchase Order Terms)(Garofalo, Mel)
November 8, 2021 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #43 , #8 Defendant Radiator Specialty Company, Inc's Motion to Dismiss by Robert Bogle. Replies due by 11/15/2021 (Jenkins, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 , #8 to Defendant Radiator Specialty Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Robert Bogle. Replies due by 11/15/2021 (Jenkins, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O. Jenkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jenkins, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Filing 60 ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Radiator Specialty Company, Inc. by JD Technologies, Inc..(Raynor, Kenneth)
October 12, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION for Hearing re #47 Rule 12i Motion to Dismiss by JD Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 10/26/2021 (Raynor, Kenneth)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #55 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #43 , #47 . Responses due by 11/8/2021. Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 26, 2021 to secure local counsel to file a notice in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/8/21. (mga)
October 12, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Local counsel file notice of appearance by 10/26/2021. (mga)
October 11, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION to Substitute Attorney of Record by JD Technologies, Inc.. (Raynor, Kenneth) Modified to convert event to a Motion on 10/13/2021 (clc).
October 11, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. Raynor on behalf of JD Technologies, Inc. (Raynor, Kenneth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 55 EMERGENCY MOTION to Continue Outstanding Deadlines re: the filing of an opposition to defendant's #43 MOTION to Dismiss and also for local counsel to file an appearance on behalf of plaintiff by Robert Bogle. Responses due by 10/22/2021 (rth). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Clem C. Trischler for Radiator Specialty Company, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/6/21. (mga)
October 6, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Clem C. Trischler Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5256841. by Radiator Specialty Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 List of Court Admissions) (Garofalo, Mel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 6, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Mel Joseph Garofalo on behalf of Radiator Specialty Company, Inc. (Garofalo, Mel)
October 4, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Notice to David A. Colecchia, Howard S Ross, Susan D. Garrard, Clem C. Trischler: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/12/2021. (tms)
September 27, 2021 Filing 51 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-00319. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
September 27, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
September 27, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (rth)
September 27, 2021 Notice to David A. Colecchia, Howard S Ross, Susan D. Garrard, Clem C. Trischler: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/4/2021. (rth)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED ORDER granting #40 Motion to Transfer Case. Following consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer and Defendants' responses to the same, it is hereby ordered that this case shall be transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina in Charlotte, North Carolina. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and any scheduling related to the same will be addressed by the transferee court. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/23/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of WESTERN DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA. (jd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Transfer Case. Following consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer and Defendants' responses to the same, it is hereby ordered that this case shall be transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina in Charlotte, North Carolina. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and any scheduling related to the same will be addressed by the transferee court. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/22/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) Modified text on 9/23/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 48 BRIEF in Support re #47 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Failure to State a Claim re #39 Amended Complaint by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case to North Carolina filed by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 45 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #40 Motion to Transfer Case, filed by RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Trischler, Clem) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 44 BRIEF in Support re #43 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC.. (Trischler, Clem) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Trischler, Clem)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 6, 2021 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROBERT BOGLE re #40 Motion to Transfer Case, #39 Amended Complaint, #41 Proposed Order (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 6, 2021 Filing 41 Proposed Order re #40 Motion to Transfer Case by ROBERT BOGLE. (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Transfer Case to North Carolina by ROBERT BOGLE. (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 39 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC., filed by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I) (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Following consideration of JDS's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 34) and Supplemental Declaration (ECF No. 34-1), Plaintiff's Response (ECF No. 36), and for the reasons stated in this Court's Opinion (ECF No. 37), the Motion for Reconsideration is granted. This Court's Opinion and Order relative only to JDS's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) is vacated for reconsideration.Upon reconsideration of JDSs Motion to Dismiss pursuant of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (ECF No. 11), the respective briefs and responses of the parties (ECF Nos. 12, 24, 26 and 29-30), and for the reasons stated in this Court's Opinion (ECF No. 37), JDS's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) is granted. Therefore, the claims against JDS are subject to dismissal both on personal jurisdiction grounds as well as under the Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) grounds as previously determined by this Court's July 16, 2021 Opinion and Order (ECF Nos. 32 and 33). In addition to the leave previously granted to Plaintiff, with regard to the claims dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), Plaintiff is further granted leave to file an amended complaint to address the present jurisdictional defects against JDS. Alternatively, Plaintiff will be granted leave to move to transfer to another jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file anamended complaint and/or motion to transfer on or before September 7, 2021. Any Defendant(s) shall respond to said pleading and/or motion on or before September 21, 2021. If Plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint or Motion to Transfer on or before September 7, 2021, Defendant, JDS's, motion to dismiss will be granted, and JDS will be dismissed as a party in this case.DATED this 6th day of August, 2021.Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/6/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION After consideration of JDS's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 34), Supplemental Declaration (ECF No. 34-1), Plaintiff's Response (ECF No. 36), and for the foregoing reasons, the Motion for Reconsideration will be granted. This Court's July 16, 2021 Opinion and Order relative only to JDSs Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) will be vacated for reconsideration.Accordingly, after reconsideration of JDS's Motion to Dismiss pursuant of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (ECF No. 11) and the respective briefs and responses of the parties (ECF Nos. 12, 24, 26 and 29-30), JDS's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) will be granted. Therefore, the claims against JDS will be subject to dismissal both on personal jurisdiction grounds as well as under the Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) grounds as stated in this Court's July 16, 2021 Opinion and Order (ECF Nos. 32 and 33). In addition to the leave previously granted to Plaintiff with regard to the claims dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), Plaintiff will begranted leave to file an amended complaint to address the present jurisdictional defects against JDS. Alternatively, Plaintiff will be granted leave to move to transfer to another jurisdiction. A separate order will follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/6/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 36 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to 35 Order, #34 Motion for Reconsideration, filed by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER It is hereby ordered that any party wishing to respond to the Motion for Reconsideration #34 shall file their response on or before July 29, 2021. Pleading deadlines outlined by the Court #33 are hereby suspended until the Court resolves the Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/22/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Reconsideration re #33 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #32 Memorandum Opinion,, by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) is denied, and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) is granted. Mr. Bogle's Complaint is dismissed. Mr. Bogle is granted leave to amend. Any amended complaint shall be filed on or before July 30, 2021. Defendants shall answer or respond to any amended complaint on or before August 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/16/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION Following consideration of Mr. Bogle's Complaint (ECF No. 1), Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF No. 8 and 11), the respective briefs and responses of the parties (ECF Nos. 9, 12, 24-26 and 29-30), and for the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) will be denied, and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) will be granted. Mr. Bogle will be granted leave to amend. A separate order will follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/16/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROBERT BOGLE re #30 Sur-Reply Brief (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 30 Sur-Reply Brief supplemental to the brief filed at Doc 29 re #29 Sur-Reply Brief, #27 Motion for Leave to File, 28 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 29 Sur-Reply Brief re #26 Reply Brief, #25 Reply Brief, 28 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Ross, Howard) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Plaintiff's Sur-Reply shall be filed on or before July 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/30/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File SUR-REBUTTAL BRIEF(S) IN OPPOSITION TO THE REPLY BRIEFS FILED BY DEFENDANTS by ROBERT BOGLE. (Ross, Howard) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF re #24 Brief in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss filed by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #8 Motion to Dismiss, #9 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(2) and Rule 12(B)(6) filed by RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC.. (Trischler, Clem) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 24 BRIEF in Opposition re #8 Motion to Dismiss, #11 Motion to Dismiss filed by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) (Ross, Howard) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #11 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 6/18/2021; Replies due by 6/25/2021. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/15/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Howard S. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/15/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Howard S. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6565284) by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certification for Bar Admission, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ross, Howard) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Order, by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, by ROBERT BOGLE Affiant: Robert Bogle. (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 14, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #18 Errata. ERROR: Filing attorney not the attorney requesting pro hac vice admission. CORRECTION: See LCvR 83.2(B) PRO HAC VICE ADMISSIONS. A motion for admission pro hac vice must be made by the attorney seeking to be admitted (using their own login info) and must be accompanied by an affidavit from the attorney seeking to be admitted pro hac vice. Attorney seeking admission is advised to sign and submit a new document using ERRATA event (so as to avoid repaying the filing fee), link filing to the previously filed motion and attach a proposed order.ATTORNEY ROSS REQUIRED TO DO FILING OF DOCUMENT AS WELL AS SIGNING THE DOCUMENT> ACTION REQUIRED (jd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 13, 2021 Filing 18 Errata re Quality Control message - Generic Correction, #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ROBERT BOGLE. Reason for Correction: Attorney Ross is to be identified as the filer. (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 8, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. ERROR: Attorney Ross must file the motion to appear pro hac vice. CORRECTION: using the eratta event, refile motion with Attorney Ross signature. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Howard S. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/7/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Howard S. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6549556) by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service) (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service) (Colecchia, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER The Stipulationof the Parties #13 is hereby adopted and it is ordered that the time for Plaintiff's Response to the Motionto Dismiss filed on behalf of Defendant JD Technologies, Inc. is hereby extended to June 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/2/2021. (bjl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support re #11 Motion to Dismiss filed by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Court) (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond by RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Trischler, Clem) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Trischler, Clem) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Trischler, Clem) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying JD Technologies, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/25/2021. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan D. Garrard on behalf of JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. waiver sent on 3/23/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Garrard, Susan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC.. RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 3/14/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Trischler, Clem) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JD TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number 24668067833), filed by ROBERT BOGLE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 RECEIPT) (jd) Modified on 3/10/2021 (jd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bogle v. JD Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bogle
Represented By: David A. Colecchia
Represented By: Howard S Ross
Represented By: Robert O. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Susan D. Garrard
Represented By: Kenneth R. Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiator Specialty Company, Inc.
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Represented By: Mel Joseph Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?