United States of America v. Approximately $129,850 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $129,850 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2021cv00509
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 10/28/2001. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service (Direct Notice) by United States of America re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Department of the Treasury Process Receipt and Return re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, filed by United States of America. (Johnson, J.)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns on 9/27/2021. (kab)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in rem against Approximately $129,850 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America.(Johnson, J.)
September 27, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kab)
September 27, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (kab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $129,850 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J. Seth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $129,850 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?