Griffin v. USA
Petitioner: Christopher Lee Griffin
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00513
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER 2255 MOTION. Responses due by 11/29/2021. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/29/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
September 28, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No. 3:14-cr-00082-RJC-DSC-4 ( USA2255Group added.), filed by Christopher Lee Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Lee Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?