Vigdor et al v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Pusey Vigdor, Vanessa Krombeen, Vashista Kokkirala, Jessica Huck, Richard Smithson, Ronald Easter, Providence Anesthesiology Associates, P.A. and Robert Vigdor
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc., UMR, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2021cv00517
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
2 Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court due to lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Replies due by 12/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/23/2021. (kab).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court due to lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Ronald Easter, Jessica Huck, Vashista Kokkirala, Vanessa Krombeen, Providence Anesthesiology Associates, P.A., Richard Smithson, Cynthia Pusey Vigdor, Robert Vigdor. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Gregson, Grace). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Jane Stalinski re #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Plan Document, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpt of Plan Document, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpt of Plan Document, #5 Exhibit D - Excerpt of Plan Document, #6 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Plan Document, #7 Exhibit F - Excerpt of Plan Document, #8 Exhibit G - Chart)(McGuire, Matthew)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court due to lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc.. Replies due by 11/29/2021 (McGuire, Matthew)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Plaintiffs' Claims Against UMR, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) All Plaintiffs' Claims for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief May be Granted; and (3) In the Alter. Replies due by 12/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/19/21. (mga)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc.. Responses due by 12/3/2021 (McGuire, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Plaintiffs' Claims Against UMR, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) All Plaintiffs' Claims for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief May be Granted; and (3) In the Alter by Ronald Easter, Jessica Huck, Vashista Kokkirala, Vanessa Krombeen, Providence Anesthesiology Associates, P.A., Richard Smithson, Cynthia Pusey Vigdor, Robert Vigdor. Replies due by 11/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TeamHealth case article)(Gregson, Grace)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court due to lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Responses due by 11/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/10/21. (mga)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Dkt. No. 19) by UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc.. Responses due by 11/24/2021 (McGuire, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 11/17/2021. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/3/2021. (ams)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court due to lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Ronald Easter, Jessica Huck, Vashista Kokkirala, Vanessa Krombeen, Providence Anesthesiology Associates, P.A., Richard Smithson, Cynthia Pusey Vigdor, Robert Vigdor. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Gulf-to-Bay Anesthesiology Associates LLC v. UnitedHealthCare of Florida Inc., #3 Exhibit Emergency Care Services of Pennsylvania PC v. UnitedHealth Group Inc., #4 Exhibit UHC Opposition Brief Excerpt)(Gregson, Grace)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court due to lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Ronald Easter, Jessica Huck, Vashista Kokkirala, Vanessa Krombeen, Providence Anesthesiology Associates, P.A., Richard Smithson, Cynthia Pusey Vigdor, Robert Vigdor. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Gregson, Grace). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Plaintiffs' Claims Against UMR, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) All Plaintiffs' Claims for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief May be Granted; and (3) In the Alter by Ronald Easter, Jessica Huck, Vashista Kokkirala, Vanessa Krombeen, Providence Anesthesiology Associates, P.A., Richard Smithson, Cynthia Pusey Vigdor, Robert Vigdor. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Gregson, Grace). Modified on 10/28/2021 to remove referral (mek).
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Providence Anesthesiology Associates, P.A. (Gregson, Grace)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Mitchell Armbruster on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Armbruster, J.)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Shaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shaw, Robert) Modified to correct text on 10/21/2021 (clc).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace A. Gregson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gregson, Grace) Modified to correct text on 10/21/2021 (clc).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jane Stalinski re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Plaintiffs' Claims Against UMR, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) All Plaintiffs' Claims for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief May be Granted; and (3) In the Alter filed by UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Plan Document, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpt of Plan Document, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpt of Plan Document, #5 Exhibit D - Excerpt of Plan Document, #6 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Plan Document, #7 Exhibit F - Excerpt of Plan Document, #8 Exhibit G - Chart)(McGuire, Matthew)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of John H. Aman re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Plaintiffs' Claims Against UMR, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) All Plaintiffs' Claims for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief May be Granted; and (3) In the Alter filed by UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Medical Group Participation Agreement)(McGuire, Matthew)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Plaintiffs' Claims Against UMR, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) All Plaintiffs' Claims for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief May be Granted; and (3) In the Alter by UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc.. (McGuire, Matthew)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Plaintiffs' Claims Against UMR, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; (2) All Plaintiffs' Claims for Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief May be Granted; and (3) In the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration as to Providence Anesthesiology Associates, P.A.'s Claims by UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc.. Responses due by 11/3/2021 (McGuire, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants answer due 10/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/6/21. (mga)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc.. (McGuire, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ef)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Patrick McGuire on behalf of UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc. (McGuire, Matthew)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (McGowan, Emily)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UMR, Inc. (McGowan, Emily)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc. (McGowan, Emily)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company (McGowan, Emily)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Claire McGowan on behalf of UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc. (McGowan, Emily)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 2021-CVS-13028. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5245748), filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UMR, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Defendants' Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Class Action Complaint Filed in Mecklenburg County Superior Court, #3 Exhibit B - General Civil Action Cover Sheet Filed in Mecklenburg County Superior Court, #4 Exhibit C - Civil Summons Issued to UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company by Assistant Clerk of Superior Court, #5 Exhibit D - Civil Summons Issued to UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc. by Assistant Clerk of Superior Court, #6 Exhibit E - Civil Summons Issued to UMR, Inc. by Assistant Clerk of Superior Court, #7 Exhibit F - Civil Summons Issued to UnitedHealth Group, Inc. by Assistant Clerk of Superior Court)(McGowan, Emily)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigdor et al v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Pusey Vigdor
Represented By: J. Mitchell Armbruster
Represented By: Grace A. Gregson
Represented By: Robert W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Krombeen
Represented By: J. Mitchell Armbruster
Represented By: Grace A. Gregson
Represented By: Robert W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vashista Kokkirala
Represented By: J. Mitchell Armbruster
Represented By: Grace A. Gregson
Represented By: Robert W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Huck
Represented By: J. Mitchell Armbruster
Represented By: Grace A. Gregson
Represented By: Robert W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Smithson
Represented By: J. Mitchell Armbruster
Represented By: Grace A. Gregson
Represented By: Robert W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Easter
Represented By: J. Mitchell Armbruster
Represented By: Grace A. Gregson
Represented By: Robert W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Anesthesiology Associates, P.A.
Represented By: J. Mitchell Armbruster
Represented By: Grace A. Gregson
Represented By: Robert W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Vigdor
Represented By: Grace A. Gregson
Represented By: J. Mitchell Armbruster
Represented By: Robert W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Represented By: Emily Claire McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of North Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Represented By: Emily Claire McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Represented By: Emily Claire McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Represented By: Emily Claire McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?