Gause v. Driggers et al
Plaintiff: Walter Timothy Gause
Defendant: Curtis Driggers, Denzil H. Forreta, Kimberly P. Hoppin, Amy Moekye, Christian Hoel, Clerk of Superior Court Mecklenburg County, City of Charlotte and Norman Butler
Case Number: 3:2021cv00553
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 USCA Case Number 21-7674 for #12 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: Kirsten Hancock. (ejb)
December 2, 2021 Filing 13 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal (tlj)
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 Pro Se NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Clerk's Judgment, #9 Order Dismissing Case, Terminate Motions by Walter Timothy Gause. (IFP) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
December 2, 2021 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #12 Notice of Appeal. (tlj)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER re #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Text of Order: The #11 Pro se Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint is DENIED as MOOT. So Ordered. Entered by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/29/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 Pro Se MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint Continued, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Envelope) (ef)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/18/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: (1) The #8 Order waiving the initial partial filing fee and directing monthly payments from Plaintiff's inmate account is VACATED, and Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees and Costs is DENIED; (2) Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); (3) The Clerk is instructed to update the docket in this matter to designate Docket No. 3 as a Motion to Amend Complaint; (4) Plaintiff's motions to amend complaint [Docs. 3, 4] are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court's Financial Department is instructed to reimburse Plaintiff for funds that have been collected for the payment of his filing fee, if any, and to mail a copy of this Order to the Scotland Correctional Institution so that withdrawals from Plaintiff's inmate account for this case can be terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/18/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (khm)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 ***VACATED pursuant to the Court's #9 Order.*** ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Walter Timothy Gause. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 11/16/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms) Modified text on 11/18/2021 to show this Order has been Vacated. (khm)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Pro Se NOTICE of Change of Address by Walter Timothy Gause (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Walter Timothy Gause (js) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2021: #1 Envelope) (js).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Walter Timothy Gause. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ef)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ef) Modified on 11/18/2021 to change from Amended Complaint to a Motion to Amend Complaint pursuant to the Court's #9 Order. (khm)
October 18, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (js) Modified to correct event on 10/18/2021 (js).
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Walter Timothy Gause. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gause v. Driggers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Timothy Gause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Driggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denzil H. Forreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly P. Hoppin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Moekye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Hoel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of Superior Court Mecklenburg County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?