Courtney v. Rain or Shine Golf, LLC
Plaintiff: John Courtney
Defendant: Rain or Shine Golf, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00639
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/9/2022. (brl)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rain or Shine Golf, LLC.(Capitano, A.)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rain or Shine Golf, LLC (Capitano, A.)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by John Courtney. Rain or Shine Golf, LLC served on 12/9/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Stanton, Corey)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Rain or Shine Golf, LLC answer due 1/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/15/21. (mga)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Rain or Shine Golf, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Capitano, A.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Rain or Shine Golf, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rain or Shine Golf, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5336668), filed by John Courtney.(Stanton, Corey)
November 30, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courtney v. Rain or Shine Golf, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Courtney
Represented By: Corey Michael Stanton
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rain or Shine Golf, LLC
Represented By: A. Todd Capitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?