Williams v. City of Charlotte et al
Plaintiff: Patrice Williams
Defendant: City of Charlotte, Brandon Ottelin and Tiffany Anderson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00649
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 cv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant City of Charlotte's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint contained in the Notice of Removal. Defendant City of Charlotte answer due 2/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/7/22. (mga)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Charlotte. (Matherson, Clarence). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence E. Matherson, Jr on behalf of City of Charlotte (Matherson, Clarence)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Brandon Ottelin.(Keeton, Lori)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Tiffany Anderson.(Keeton, Lori)
December 7, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 21-CVS-14146. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5346542), filed by Tiffany Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Keeton, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of Charlotte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Williams
Represented By: Dominique L. Camm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Represented By: Clarence E. Matherson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Ottelin
Represented By: Lori R. Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Anderson
Represented By: Lori R. Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?