Asr v. Giftos et al
Plaintiff: Leila Nasser Asr
Defendant: Peter M. Giftos and Novant Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00670
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss, #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/23/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/26/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DLG)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Leila Nasser Asr. Responses due by 2/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (js). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peter M. Giftos (Moyers, Gary)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novant Health, Inc. (Moyers, Gary)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Novant Health, Inc.. (Moyers, Gary)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Novant Health, Inc.. Responses due by 2/2/2022 (Moyers, Gary)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Peter M. Giftos. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Moyers, Gary)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Peter M. Giftos. Responses due by 1/27/2022 (Moyers, Gary)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Adam Moyers on behalf of All Defendants (Moyers, Gary)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leila Nasser Asr. Novant Health, Inc. served on 12/27/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leila Nasser Asr. Peter M. Giftos served on 12/24/2021, answer due 1/14/2022. (js) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2022: #1 Envelope) (js).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Peter M. Giftos, Novant Health, Inc.. (tlj)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. And #Initial Scheduling Order and Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The document was served conventionally by US Mail (tlj)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion to file electronically and to receive electronic notifications. Motion is granted as to receiving electronic notifications. Motion is otherwise denied. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/17/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DLG)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION to File Documents Electronically by Leila Nasser Asr. Responses due by 12/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlj). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Peter M. Giftos, Novant Health, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CHD068965), filed by Leila Nasser Asr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asr v. Giftos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila Nasser Asr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter M. Giftos
Represented By: Gary Adam Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novant Health, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Adam Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?