Robinson v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shahema Robinson
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. and Hospitality Ventures Management Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00027
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 10/25/2022. Motions due by 11/23/2022. Mediator Designation deadline set for 5/10/2022. Mediation deadline set for 11/10/2022. Jury Trial - TBD - in or about February 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/22/22. (mga)
February 22, 2022 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr no longer assigned to the case pursuant to #4 Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
February 21, 2022 Filing 4 Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. (Wright, John)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan . ALL Parties Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction (Wright, John)
February 1, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/22/2022. (brl)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Hospitality Ventures Management Group LLC, Marriott International, Inc..(Wright, John)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg Superior, case number 21-cvs-18569. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5405917), filed by Hospitality Ventures Management Group LLC, Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Correspondence, #3 Exhibit State Notice Of Removal)(Wright, John)
January 24, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahema Robinson
Represented By: K. Brandon Remington
Represented By: William Trippe Mckeny, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: John Pelczar Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality Ventures Management Group LLC
Represented By: John Pelczar Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?