Hall et al v. Charlotte Arena Operations, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joanne Hall and Alfred Hall
Defendant: Charlotte Arena Operations, LLC, Hornets Sports & Entertainment, Spectrum Center, Inc., City of Charlotte, North Carolina, Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King of Charlotte Janitorial and Commercial Cleaning Servics, Inc., Jani-King Franchising, Inc., John Doe, Inc. and Richard Roe, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00032
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued Conventionally by U.S. Mail as to Charlotte Arena Operations, LLC, City of Charlotte, North Carolina, Hornets Sports & Entertainment, Jani-King Franchising, Inc., Jani-King International, Inc., Jani-King of Charlotte Janitorial and Commercial Cleaning Servics, Inc., John Doe, Inc., Richard Roe, Inc., Spectrum Center, Inc.. (ef) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/3/2022) (ef).
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:22-cv-00040. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
January 26, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
January 26, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The order was served conventionally. (rth)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER - The action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/25/2022. Sent to Joanne Hall and Alfred Hall at 41 Foxwood Dr. Moorestown, NJ 08057 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/26/2022.]
January 25, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Alfred Hall, Joanne Hall. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/26/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Alfred Hall, Joanne Hall. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/26/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number RAL089683), filed by Alfred Hall, Joanne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Envelope) (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/26/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Charlotte Arena Operations, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Arena Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornets Sports & Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jani-King International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jani-King of Charlotte Janitorial and Commercial Cleaning Servics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jani-King Franchising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?