Rovnyak v. City of Charlotte et al
Plaintiff: Steven M Rovnyak
Defendant: City of Charlotte, Mecklenburg EMS Agency and Medic Mecklenburg EMS Agency
Case Number: 3:2022cv00064
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Steven M Rovnyak. Replies due by 4/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Field, J.)
April 13, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Steven M Rovnyak. Replies due by 4/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Field, J.)
April 13, 2022 Filing 12 Consent CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (McDonnell, Robert)
March 29, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant, City of Charlotte by Steven M Rovnyak. Responses due by 4/12/2022 (Field, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 29, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Medic's Motion to Dismiss by Steven M Rovnyak. Responses due by 4/12/2022 (Field, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/13/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/29/2022. (DLG)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/14/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/29/2022. (DLG)
March 17, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Charlotte. Responses due by 3/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (McDonnell, Robert)
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by City of Charlotte.(McDonnell, Robert)
March 16, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Medic Mecklenburg EMS Agency.(Webb, Mary)
March 16, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Medic Mecklenburg EMS Agency. (Webb, Mary)
March 16, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Medic Mecklenburg EMS Agency. Responses due by 3/30/2022 (Webb, Mary)
February 21, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medic Mecklenburg EMS Agency (Coleman, Edward)
February 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward E. Coleman, III on behalf of Medic Mecklenburg EMS Agency (Coleman, Edward)
February 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M Webb on behalf of Medic Mecklenburg EMS Agency (Webb, Mary)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of Mecklenburg County, case number 21 CVS 20082. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5444360), filed by City of Charlotte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Civil Summons filed in Sate Court, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit Consent to Removal by Defendant Medic Mecklenburg EMS Agency, #4 Exhibit Proof of Date of Service on Defendant City of Charlotte)(McDonnell, Robert)
February 17, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
February 17, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rovnyak v. City of Charlotte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Rovnyak
Represented By: J. Elliott Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Represented By: Robert D McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mecklenburg EMS Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medic Mecklenburg EMS Agency
Represented By: Edward E. Coleman, III
Represented By: Mary M Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?