Abee-Reeves v. Cathey et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Abee-Reeves
Defendant: Eddie Cathey, Shilo Garner and Brian Wicker
Case Number: 3:2022cv00164
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Patricia Ann Abee-Reeves. All Defendants. (Pappalardo, Sophia)
June 10, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Eddie Cathey, Shilo Garner, Brian Wicker. (Christian, D.)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Patricia Ann Abee-Reeves. Replies due by 6/10/2022 (Caudill, Bo)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document #11 Unredacted Document First Amended Complaint by Patricia Ann Abee-Reeves. Responses due by 6/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal) (Caudill, Bo). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 3, 2022 Filing 11 First Amended Complaint-Unredacted (Sealed - Attorney) (available to Patricia Ann Abee-Reeves) (Caudill, Bo) Modified on 6/7/2022 (ams).
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document #11 Unredacted Document First Amended Complaint. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/3/2022. (DLG)
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Eddie Cathey, Shilo Garner, Brian Wicker.(Flanagan, Patrick)
May 13, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Eddie Cathey, Shilo Garner.(Flanagan, Patrick)
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Patricia Ann Abee-Reeves. Responses due by 5/27/2022 (Caudill, Bo). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Responses due by 6/3/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/13/2022. (KCA)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Eddie Cathey, Shilo Garner, Brian Wicker. Responses due by 5/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Christian, D.)
May 2, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Brian Wicker. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ams)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Patricia Ann Abee-Reeves.(Caudill, Bo)
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eddie Cathey, Shilo Garner.(Flanagan, Patrick)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Brandon Christian on behalf of All Defendants (Christian, D.)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(js)
April 18, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5530252), filed by Patricia Ann Abee-Reeves.(Caudill, Bo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abee-Reeves v. Cathey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Abee-Reeves
Represented By: Bo Brandon Caudill
Represented By: Sophia M. Pappalardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Cathey
Represented By: D. Brandon Christian
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shilo Garner
Represented By: D. Brandon Christian
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wicker
Represented By: D. Brandon Christian
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?