Gittens v. Higdon et al
Plaintiff: Jamaal A Gittens
Defendant: Steve Higdon and Chelsey Wilson
Case Number: 3:2022cv00165
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION by Steve Higdon, Chelsey Wilson. Replies due by 6/21/2022 (O'Brien, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Steve Higdon, Chelsey Wilson. Responses due by 6/27/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (O'Brien, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Curran O'Brien on behalf of All Defendants (O'Brien, Elizabeth)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION to Transfer to U.S. District Court 28 U.S. 1446 by Jamaal A Gittens. Responses due by 6/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (tlj). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamaal A Gittens. Steve Higdon and Chelsey Wilson served to Shannon Sells on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (brl)
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Steve Higdon, Chelsey Wilson. (tlj)
May 13, 2022 Filing Fee Received: $ 402, receipt number CHD071198 (tlj)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 Pro Se AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jamaal A Gittens. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until 5/17/22 to pay the filing fee or file an amended Application. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/2/22. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
May 2, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended IFP Application due by 5/17/2022 or Filing Fee due by 5/17/2022. (clc)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamaal A Gittens. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (tlj)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $402.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 5/9/2022. (js)
April 18, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)
April 18, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The order was served conventionally. (js)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamaal A Gittens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Envelope)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gittens v. Higdon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaal A Gittens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Higdon
Represented By: Elizabeth Curran O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsey Wilson
Represented By: Elizabeth Curran O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?