United States of America v. Approximately $597,891.46 in Funds
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $597,891.46 in Funds
Case Number: 3:2022cv00176
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 05/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service (Direct Notice) by United States of America re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 Department of the Treasury Process Receipt and Return re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, filed by United States of America. (Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property signed by Frank G. Johns, Clerk of Court on 4/21/2022 (js)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against Approximately $597,891.46 in Funds, filed by United States of America.(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
April 21, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $597,891.46 in Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $597,891.46 in Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?