USA v. Approximately $33,100 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Approximately $33,100 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2022cv00219
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 06/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing by Richard G. Huizenga (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(ef)
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of SERVICE (DIRECT NOTICE) by USA re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Department of the Treasury Process Receipt and Return re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, filed by USA. (Johnson, J.)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property. Signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns. (ef)
May 17, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ef)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Approximately $33,100 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Johnson, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approximately $33,100 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: J. Seth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $33,100 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?