USA v. Approximately $27,000 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Approximately $27,000 in United States Currency
Claimant: Larry Saunders
Case Number: 3:2022cv00232
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 10 CLAIM Verified by Larry Saunders. (Young, Christopher)
July 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael Young on behalf of Approximately $27,000 in United States Currency (Young, Christopher)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher Michael Young for Approximately $27,000 in United States Currency. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/7/2022. (mek)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher M. Young Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5646799. by Approximately $27,000 in United States Currency. (Young, Erin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 29, 2022 Filing 6 SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date June 24, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of SERVICE (DIRECT NOTICE) by USA re #4 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Approximately $27,000 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Johnson, J.)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 Department of the Treasury Process Receipt and Return re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, filed by USA. (Johnson, J.)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property. Signed by Clerk Frank G. Johns on 5/25/2022. (tlj)
May 25, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Approximately $27,000 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Johnson, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approximately $27,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: J. Seth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $27,000 in United States Currency
Represented By: Christopher Michael Young
Represented By: Erin McNeil Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Larry Saunders
Represented By: Christopher Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?