Hubbard v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marc Hubbard
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, First Equities Financial LLC and Asheth Hemant Patel
Case Number: 3:2022cv00302
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed, #2 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit Sheriffs Deed, #4 Exhibit QCD, #5 Exhibit Special Warranty Deed, #6 Exhibit Lease Agreement, #7 Exhibit Goodbye Letter, #8 Exhibit Order to FCL Sale, #9 Exhibit Report of Sale, #10 Exhibit Deed, #11 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #12 Exhibit Deed and DOT, #13 Exhibit Docket with Complaint, #14 Exhibit Mtn for Declaratory Jgmt)(Mestre, Michael)
August 3, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued Conventionally as to First Equities Financial LLC. (tlj)
July 25, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Asheth Hemant Patel. (tlj)
July 25, 2022 Filing Fee Received: $ 402, receipt number CHD072278 (tlj)
July 22, 2022 Filing 8 Pro Se WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marc Hubbard. Nationstar Mortgage LLC waiver sent on 7/14/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tlj)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 Pro Se REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nationstar Mortgage LLC on 7/14/2022 by Marc Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tlj)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file an Application (Long Form, AO Form 239), within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order or pay the filing fee. Failure to file an Amended Application within the time required or, if the Plaintiff chooses, to pay the filing fee, will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/20/22. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
July 20, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Filing Fee due by 8/4/2022 or IFP Application (Long Form, AO 239) due by 8/4/2022. (clc)
July 14, 2022 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #3 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 7/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Mestre, Michael). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sterling Mestre on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Mestre, Michael)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #3 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment. Responses due by 8/19/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/14/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DLG)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Marc Hubbard. Responses due by 7/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlj). Modified on 7/6/2022 to remove referral (mek).
July 5, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marc Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlj)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Marc Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(tlj)
July 5, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. And #Initial Scheduling Order and Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The document was served conventionally by US Mail (tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Michael Sterling Mestre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Equities Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asheth Hemant Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?