Stout v. Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: John J Stout and John J. Stout
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00313
Filed: July 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Four (4) to Five (5) Days. Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Mediation TBD. Motions due by 7/31/2023. Jury Trial set for 11/6/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/12/2022. (brl)
September 8, 2022 Filing 9 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Lucchesi, Kathleen)
August 22, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/12/2022. (brl)
August 18, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Fifth Third Bank, N.A..(Lucchesi, Kathleen)
August 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Noel Harlow on behalf of John J. Stout (Harlow, Noel)
August 9, 2022 SECOND Notice to Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/16/2022. (rth)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson for Fifth Third Bank, N.A. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/1/22. (mga)
August 1, 2022 Notice to Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/8/2022. (mga)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5678374. by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Lucchesi, Kathleen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Fifth Third Bank, N.A. answer due 8/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/20/2022. (kab)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Lucchesi, Kathleen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 14, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
July 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Kanable Lucchesi on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, N.A. (Lucchesi, Kathleen)
July 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 22-CVS-5051. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5655610), filed by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Gehlauf Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Lucchesi, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stout v. Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Stout
Represented By: Joshua Reed Van Kampen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Stout
Represented By: Joshua Reed Van Kampen
Represented By: Noel Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kathleen Kanable Lucchesi
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?