Howard v. Jaffa et al
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Howard, Jr.
Defendant: Ben Jaffa, Jr., Graham Investment Company and Jay Realty Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00315
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Filing 6 Pro Se Addendum by Lorenzo Howard, Jr. Addendum to #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/28/2022. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. No. 1) is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/28/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lorenzo Howard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlj). Modified to remove referral on 7/20/2022 (kab).
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of 402.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 8/8/2022. (tlj)
July 18, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally by US Mail (tlj)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Lorenzo Howard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Jaffa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Jaffa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Investment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Realty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?