Moreno v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Britney Moreno
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00602
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 8 Parties Notice of Settlement. COURT NOTICE to the Parties: Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court may dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 1/30/2023. (Auckland, Hannah)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #5 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/29/2022. Entered by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 12/14/2022. (brl)
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Britney Moreno. Responses due by 12/27/2022 (Tyson, Bryan)
December 1, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WFC Short Term Disability Plan, #2 Exhibit B - STD SPD, #3 Exhibit C - Form 5500, #4 Exhibit D - STD Trust Agreement)(Dalton, Kevin)
December 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 12/15/2022 (Dalton, Kevin)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answers due 12/1/2022. Entered by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/10/2022. (brl)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Dalton, Kevin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Dalton, Kevin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Dalton, Kevin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 22-CVS-13225. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5815582), filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal Sent to State Court)(Dalton, Kevin)
November 3, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britney Moreno
Represented By: Bryan Lee Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?