Smith v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Defendant: Bank of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00612
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and allowing Plaintiff 30 days to amend complaint. If Plaintiff fails to amend the complaint within 30 days in accordance with this Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 11/30/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
November 30, 2022 Set Deadline: Amended Complaint due by 12/30/2022. (mek)
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charmane Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ef)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file an Application, using AO Form 239, within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this Order or pay the filing fee. Failure to file an Amended Application within the time required or, if the Plaintiff chooses, to pay the filing fee, will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 11/9/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
November 10, 2022 Set Deadline: Amended IFP AO Form 239 or Filing Fee due by 12/1/2022. (mek)
November 9, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally by US Mail (tlj)
November 9, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The order was served conventionally. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tlj)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charmane Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlj) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/9/2022) (tlj).
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Bank of America with Jury Demand, filed by Charmane Smith. (Attachments: # 1 DOCUMENT RE-FILED, #2 Envelope)(tlj) Modified docket text on 11/9/2022 (tlj). (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/9/2022) (tlj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?