Kunysz v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Kunysz
Defendant: Merck & Co, Inc. and Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00689
Filed: December 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC, filed by Courtney Kunysz.(Esfandiari, Bijan)
December 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally Wiest Bryan on behalf of Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC (Bryan, Sally)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dino S. Sangiamo on behalf of Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC (Sangiamo, Dino)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of Administrative Close Out of Member Cases. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/12/22. (rth)
December 28, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00734. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/28/2022; certified by the Clerk's Office from WDNC on 12/28/2022. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/28/2022.]
December 28, 2022 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 12/28/2022. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/28/2022.]
December 28, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
December 28, 2022 Case transferred to District of Western North Carolina. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/28/2022.]
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/15/2022. (kkz) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/28/2022.]
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC. (kh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/28/2022.]
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9175195), filed by Courtney Kunysz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/28/2022.]
December 9, 2022 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/28/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kunysz v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Kunysz
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co, Inc.
Represented By: Sally Wiest Bryan
Represented By: Dino S. Sangiamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC
Represented By: Dino S. Sangiamo
Represented By: Sally Wiest Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?