Cafarella v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emily Cafarella
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc. and Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00062
Filed: February 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally Wiest Bryan on behalf of Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC (Bryan, Sally)
February 5, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dino S. Sangiamo on behalf of Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC (Sangiamo, Dino)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Administrative Close Out of Member Cases. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/12/13. (rth)
February 3, 2023 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00390. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Western District of North Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of August 4, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robert J. Conrad, Jr. (LF) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Western District of North Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of August 4, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robert J. Conrad, Jr. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. (LF) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
February 3, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
February 3, 2023 Case transferred to Western District of North Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (LF) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
January 26, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC. (GO) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
January 26, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Merck & Co., Inc.. (GO) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
January 25, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Emily Cafarella (Heacox, Catherine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
January 25, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Emily Cafarella (Heacox, Catherine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
January 24, 2023 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (LJ) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
January 24, 2023 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2023: #1 Additional Corrections) (LJ). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
January 24, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
January 24, 2023 Your proposed summons was not issued for the following reasons: The section that reads "To: (Defendant's name and address)" has not been fully completed (address is missing). You must also include the complete case caption with all party text. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNYEDC-16324337 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Emily Cafarella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Cafarella v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, #2 Proposed Summons Merck & Co., Inc. Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Merck Sharp & Dohme, LLC, Proposed Summons) (Heacox, Catherine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/3/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cafarella v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Cafarella
Represented By: Catherine T. Heacox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?