McDermott v. Corelle Brands, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MARK MCDERMOTT
Defendant: CORELLE BRANDS, LLC and INSTANT BRANDS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00342
Filed: March 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Susan C Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on 7/15/2024, and every sixty (60) days thereafter, until the bankruptcy proceedings are completed. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/14/2024. (brl)
May 1, 2024 ***SET Flag(s): STAYED -BK (Bankruptcy) (clc)
May 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Andrew Hinson on behalf of Corelle Brands, LLC, Instant Brands, LLC (Hinson, Philip)
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Instant Brands LLC and its affiliate Corelle Brands LLC by Corelle Brands, LLC, Instant Brands, LLC (Hinson, Philip)
March 26, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (llp)
March 25, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(llp)
March 25, 2024 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (llp)
March 25, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Mark Mcdermott. (Jessup, Robert) Modified Docket Text on 3/26/2024 (llp). (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/8/2024) (llp).
March 25, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Henry Jessup, IV on behalf of Mark Mcdermott (Jessup, Robert) Modified Docket Text on 3/26/2024 (llp).
March 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6454799), filed by Mark Mcdermott.(Jessup, Robert) Modified Docket Text on 3/26/2024 (llp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermott v. Corelle Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MCDERMOTT
Represented By: Robert Henry Jessup, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORELLE BRANDS, LLC
Represented By: Philip Andrew Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSTANT BRANDS, LLC
Represented By: Philip Andrew Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?