Sherrill et al v. Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Onita Raynette Sherrill and Viticha L Deleon
Defendant: Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP, MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, MRCT South Florida, LLC, Kentucky Overhead Door, Inc. d/b/a Baker Insulation, MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC doing business as Modera South Park, MCRT South Florida, LLC and Kentucky Overhead Door, Inc. doing business as Baker Insulation
Case Number: 3:2024cv00443
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Fox, Faith)
June 24, 2024 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 34 Miscellaneous Filing by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. re: #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 33 Miscellaneous Filing by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. re: #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 32 Miscellaneous Filing by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. re: #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 31 Miscellaneous Filing by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. re: #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT re #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT re #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT re #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT re #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. Responses due by 7/8/2024 (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Derrenbacher on behalf of MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Forrest B. Johnson for Viticha L Deleon,Forrest B. Johnson for Onita Raynette Sherrill (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/5/24. (mga)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stanford N. Klinger for Viticha L Deleon and for Onita Raynette Sherrill (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 06/05/2024. (cjs) (Main Document 21 replaced on 6/5/2024) (cjs).
June 5, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stanford N. Klinger Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6546381. by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SC-GA Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit ga- Certificate of Good Standing) (Fox, Faith). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 5, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Forrest B. Johnson Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6546340. by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SC-GA Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit FL - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Envelope GA-Certificate of Good Standing) (Fox, Faith). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 5, 2024 Notice to Forrest B. Johnson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/12/2024. (mga)
June 5, 2024 Notice to Stanford N. Klinger: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/12/2024. (cjs)
May 31, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William James Flynn on behalf of Kentucky Overhead Door, Inc. (Flynn, William)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,. MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC answer due 6/24/2024; MCRT Carolinas, LLC answer due 6/24/2024; MCRT South Florida, LLC answer due 6/24/2024; Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC answer due 6/24/2024; Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC answer due 6/24/2024; Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP answer due 6/24/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/29/24. (mga)
May 29, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MCRT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Derrenbacher, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 29, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC served on 5/16/2024, answer due 6/6/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP served on 5/10/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC served on 5/14/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC served on 5/10/2024, answer due 5/31/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. MCRT South Florida, LLC served on 5/10/2024, answer due 5/31/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. MCRT Carolinas, LLC served on 5/10/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. MCRT Carolinas, LLC served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC served on 5/9/2024, answer due 5/30/2024. (Fox, Faith)
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. Kentucky Overhead Door, Inc. waiver sent on 5/7/2024, answer due 7/8/2024., USMS Return of Service for Complaint; Initial Scheduling; Notice of Lawsuit & Waiver Order served on W. James Flynn, Esq. on 05/07/2024, filed by Viticha L Deleon; Onita Raynette Sherrill. (Fox, Faith)
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kentucky Overhead Door, Inc., MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC, MCRT Carolinas, LLC, MRCT South Florida, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC, Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC, Onita Raynette Sherrill, Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add)
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Onita Raynette Sherrill. (Fox, Faith)
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Viticha L Deleon. (Fox, Faith)
May 3, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(add)
May 3, 2024 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (add)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6507146), filed by Viticha L Deleon, Onita Raynette Sherrill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Administration-Onita Raynette Sherrill, #2 Envelope Letters of Administration-Viticha L. Deleon)(Fox, Faith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherrill et al v. Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onita Raynette Sherrill
Represented By: Faith Renita Fox
Represented By: Forrest B. Johnson
Represented By: Stanford N. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viticha L Deleon
Represented By: Faith Renita Fox
Represented By: Stanford N. Klinger
Represented By: Forrest B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mill Creek Residential Trust, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southpark Charlotte Apartments, LP
Represented By: Christopher J Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCRT Carolinas, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mill Creek Residential Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRCT South Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Overhead Door, Inc. d/b/a Baker Insulation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCRT Carolinas Construction LLC doing business as Modera South Park
Represented By: Christopher J Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCRT South Florida, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Overhead Door, Inc. doing business as Baker Insulation
Represented By: William James Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?