Phifer v. ALDI, Inc.
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE LEE PHIFER
Defendant: ALDI, INC.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00546
Filed: June 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Susan C Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Adam J. Kress for Charlotte Lee Phifer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 08/06/2024. (cjs)
August 6, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam J. Kress Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6619509. by Charlotte Lee Phifer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Jessup, Robert). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
August 6, 2024 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/27/2024. (clc)
August 2, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ALDI, Inc..(Cushing, Meredith)
August 2, 2024 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALDI, Inc.. (Cushing, Meredith)
August 2, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith L. Cushing on behalf of ALDI, Inc. (Cushing, Meredith)
August 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Jeffries on behalf of ALDI, Inc. (Jeffries, John)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. ALDI, Inc. answer due 8/2/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 7/10/24. (mga)
July 10, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by ALDI, Inc.. (Jeffries, John). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez.
June 11, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to ALDI, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (llp)
June 11, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(llp)
June 11, 2024 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (llp)
June 10, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Charlotte Lee Phifer. (Jessup, Robert) Modified on 6/11/2024 (llp).
June 10, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Henry Jessup, IV on behalf of Charlotte Lee Phifer (Jessup, Robert) Modified on 6/11/2024 (llp).
June 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6551652), filed by Charlotte Lee Phifer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit User's Manuel)(Jessup, Robert) Modified on 6/11/2024 (llp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phifer v. ALDI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE LEE PHIFER
Represented By: Adam J. Kress
Represented By: Adam J. Kress
Represented By: Robert Henry Jessup, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDI, INC.
Represented By: Meredith L. Cushing
Represented By: John T. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?