Abrams-Kelly et al v. Davey et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Abrams-Kelly and Global Existence Foundation
Defendant: Kimberly Davey, Julie Cronin, CEENTA Associates, PA, U.S. Staff Attorneys, Timothy McMichael, Jeffrey Prieto, Dimple Chaudhary, Federal OPM General Attorneys and Brett Denton
Case Number: 3:2024cv01106
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Susan C Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2025 Filing 10 Affidavit of Records Custodian by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(llp)
February 4, 2025 Filing 9 Addendum by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. Addendum to #1 Complaint. (llp)
January 23, 2025 Filing 8 Mail (Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis) addressed to Nicole Abrams-Kelly returned as undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (llp)
January 16, 2025 Filing 7 Proposed Subpoena by Nicole Abrams-Kelly, Global Existence Foundation. re: #1 Complaint. (llp)
January 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. DENIED without prejudice to file the long form Application or pay the filing fee within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Frank D Whitney on 1/9/25. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
January 9, 2025 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Long Form IFP Application due by 2/3/2025 or Filing Fee due by 2/3/2025. (clc)
December 30, 2024 Filing 5 Addendum by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. Addendum to #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (cjs)
December 30, 2024 Filing 4 Miscellaneous Filing: Proposed Subpoenas by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(cjs)
December 23, 2024 Filing 3 Addendum by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. Addendum to #1 Complaint (llp)
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (cjs)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Proposed Summons)(cjs)
December 20, 2024 Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Litigants in Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the #Standing Order (Pro se litigant served Conventionally.)(cjs)
December 20, 2024 Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the #Standing Order (Pro se litigant served Conventionally.) (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams-Kelly et al v. Davey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Abrams-Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Existence Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEENTA Associates, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Staff Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy McMichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimple Chaudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal OPM General Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?