Abrams-Kelly v. Nissan of North America et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Abrams-Kelly
Defendant: Nissan of North America, Geico Insurance Claims Dept., David Fox, Randy Reid and Michael Feiereisel
Case Number: 3:2025cv00090
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: Susan C Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) denying without Prejudice Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as described in this Order.Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 03/26/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cjs)
March 26, 2025 Set/Reset Deadlines: Update address and filing fee or amended IFP due by 4/25/2025. (cjs)
March 20, 2025 Filing 5 Addendum by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. Addendum to #1 Complaint. (llp)
March 10, 2025 Filing 4 Mail (Public Docket Sheet, Text Order re: Unsigned Pleading, Blank IFP Signature Page, Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence, Order of Instructions) addressed to Nicole Abrams-Kelly 9932 Janeiro Dr Huntersville, NC 28078 returned as undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (add)
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 Exhibit by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. Exhibit to #1 Complaint. (add)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) (Unsigned) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicole Abrams-Kelly (add). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2025: #1 Signed Signature Page) (add). Modified to attach signature page and regenerate NEF on 2/25/2025 (add).
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Feiereisel, David Fox, Geico Insurance Claims Dept., Nissan of North America, Randy Reid, filed by Nicole Abrams-Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(add)
February 6, 2025 Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the #Standing Order (add)
February 6, 2025 Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Litigants in Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the #Standing Order (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(add)
February 6, 2025 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff shall submit an executed signature page to their #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis within 21 days of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to timely do so, Plaintiff's Complaint may be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk is instructed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the signature page of their #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis for Plaintiff to sign and return to the Court. Once the executed signature page is returned to the Court, the Clerk is directed to attach it to Plaintiff's original #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and regenerate the NEF. So Ordered by Katherine Hord Simon on 2/6/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(add)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams-Kelly v. Nissan of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Abrams-Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Insurance Claims Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Feiereisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?