Newcomb v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ward Newcomb
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2011cv00023
Filed: February 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Watauga
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated July 2, 2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ordering that Plaintiff may file a motion for summary judgment with a supporting memorandum on or before March 7, 2012. Defendant shall file a response, or notice of intent not to respond, regarding any such filing on or before March 16, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/16/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion For Summary Judgment. Plaintiff SS Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/31/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newcomb v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ward Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?