United States of America v. $58,000.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $58,000.00 in United States Currency and $800.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Stephen Sugar
Case Number: 5:2011cv00095
Filed: July 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 841
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Memorandum and Order dated 7/13/12. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (smj)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Plf's Motion For Case Management And Discovery Plan. A Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan for the case will issue shortly. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/19/11. (smj)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Kerry O'Brien for Stephen Sugar. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/29/2011. (cbb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $58,000.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas R. Ascik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $58,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $800.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephen Sugar
Represented By: Kerry O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?