Surratt v. Apple Gold, Inc.
Plaintiff: Colette Surratt
Defendant: Apple Gold, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00123
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Catawba
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ordering that parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal in this case, or in the alternative request an extension of time to file such dismissal, on or before 2/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/9/2013. (cbb)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Apple Gold's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter will proceed to jury trial during the January 2013 Statesville Trial Term with Calendar Call occurring on Monday, January 7, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. and Jury Selection beginning on Tuesday, January 8, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 12/18/2012. (cbb)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER continuing case from November, 2012, trial term to January, 2013, trial term, ( Jury Trial set for 1/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Richard Voorhees.). Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/11/2012. (cbb)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot 7 Joint Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline; granting 8 Corrected Joint Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines; ( Discovery due by 8/21/2012; Motions due by 9/24/2012; Mediation deadline set for 9/24/2012.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/12/2012. (cbb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surratt v. Apple Gold, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colette Surratt
Represented By: Geraldine Sumter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Gold, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Miller Huber
Represented By: Charles E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?