Peerless Insurance Company v. Walker
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Defendant: Michael Walker
Case Number: 5:2011cv00127
Filed: September 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Watauga
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of defendant Michael Walker in accordance with the Jury Verdict entered on November 7, 2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (cbb)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ordering that deadline for Motions in Limine is Monday, 10/22/2012; responses will be due Monday, 10/29/2012. ( Jury Selection set for Tuesday, 11/6/2012 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 2867 7 before District Judge Richard Voorhees.) Assuming there are multiple cases for trial, unless a peremptory setting (or other special accommodation) is sought and obtained in advance of the term, trial order will be determined and announced at Calendar call. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/2/2012. (cbb)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 Consent Motion for Stipulation and Consent Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/8/2012. (tmg)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Karen D. Fultz for Peerless Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/14/2011. (cbb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peerless Insurance Company v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Piccirillo Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Walker
Represented By: Stephen Mason Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?