United States of America v. Thomas
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mark S. Thomas
Case Number: 5:2011cv00181
Filed: December 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Catawba
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1080
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting Government's 33 Motion to Dismiss the Writ of Continuing Garnishment and dismissing 28 Continuing Writ of Garnishment. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 5/22/2017. (nvc)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss Writ of Continuing Garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/29/2013. (cbb)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated July 12, 2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (cbb)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER allowing defendant Mark S. Thomas until Friday, June 29, 2012 to respond to re 5 Govt's MOTION for Summary Judgment; Defendant's responses due by 6/29/2012. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 6/1/12. (smj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Youngs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?