Shoemake v. Eli Lilly & Co.

Plaintiff: Angela Shoemake
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Case Number: 5:2013cv00013
Filed: January 23, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Statesville Office
County: Wilkes
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2016 434 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ordering that this matter shall remain on the Court's May trial term calendar per the Court's 2/17/2016 433 Order. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or otherwise move for an extension of time no l ater than close of business on 3/28/2016. ( Case Settlement Deadline 3/28/2016.) The parties are reminded of their joint obligation to file periodic status reports in accordance with the Court's 2/17/2016 433 Order. The parties are notified t hat any failure to abide by the Court's directives in either this Order or the 2/17/2016 Order may subject any one of them to sanctions, monetary or otherwise, at the Court's discretion. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 3/8/2016. (cbb)
February 17, 2016 433 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing trial in this matter to the May Term beginning on 5/2/2016, ( Jury Trial set for Monday, 5/2/2016, @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Richard Voorhees) Parties shall jointly file with the Court semimonthly status reports concerning their progress and efforts in finally resolving this matter. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 2/17/2016. (cbb)
January 27, 2016 430 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case to the March Term beginning 2/29/2016. (Jury Trial set for Monday, 2/29/2016 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Richard Voorhees.) It is further ord ered that the parties shall, between today's date and 2/29/2016, jointly file periodic status reports with the Court concerning their progress and efforts in finally resolving this matter. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 1/27/2016. (cbb)
January 14, 2016 386 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 376 Motion to Seal Opposition to plf's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-13 and Exhibits Thereto. It is further ordered that the following dcmts shall be sealed until otherwise ordered by the Court: (1) Oppositio n to plf's Motion in Limine No. 2; (2) Opposition to plf's Motion in Limine No. 10; (3) Exhibits 13-42 from the Index of Exhibits in dft's Oppositions to plf's Motions in Limine filed 1/13/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/14/2016. (cbb)
December 29, 2015 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 297 Motion to Seal Eli Lily and Company's Memoranda In Support and Exhibits of Motions In Limine Nos. 3-10. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/29/2015. (tmg)
December 16, 2015 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 269 Motion to Seal Memo in Support of Motion Under FRCvP 16(f) to Enforce Court's Scheduling Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/16/2015. (cbb)
November 23, 2015 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 240 Motion to Seal Documents 241 and 245. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/23/2015. (cbb)
August 28, 2015 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding procedure for addressing deposition designations. Parties shall meet and confer on or before 10/16/2015, with goal of narrowing (or resolving entirely) any remaining objections to deposition designations. Part ies may exchange with each other, rather than file with the Court, all respective deposition designations, objections, and counter-designations. After 10/16/2015 meet and confer session, parties shall file with Court only those documents relevant to any outstanding matters that require court intervention. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 8/28/2015. (cbb)
July 7, 2015 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 207 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Barry H. Boise for Eli Lilly and Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/6/2015. (cbb)
May 8, 2015 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion to Seal. The following dcmts shall be sealed until otherwise ordered by the Court: Dcmt. Nos. 104, 108, 88, 97, 94, 100, 91, and 112. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/7/2015. (cbb)
April 30, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/29/2015. (cbb)
April 1, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Joseph J. Zonies for Angela Shoemake. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/1/2015. (cbb)
March 23, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Seth R. Oltman for Eli Lilly and Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on March 23, 2015. (cbb)
March 12, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Christopher W. Wasson for Eli Lilly and Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/12/15. (smj)
February 25, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Allan A. Theon for Eli Lilly and Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/24/15. (smj)
February 20, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Ronni E. Fuchs for Eli Lilly and Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/19/15. (smj)
February 2, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Andrew E. Schinzel for Eli Lilly and Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/2/2015. (cbb)
January 26, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 57 Joint MOTION for Extension of ADR Deadline. Discovery due by 3/2/2015. Mediation deadline set for 3/9/2015. Motions due by 3/16/2015. The parties shall file a joint "Notice" with the Cour t due by 2/9/2015, identifying their mediator and mediation date. Defendant's Expert Report due 2/13/15. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2015 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Richard Voorhees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/23/15. (smj)
January 12, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Rule on 3rd Party Motion to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order. Plf may renew its request if it can establish that: (1) the issue of "Patrizia Cavazzoni's Notice of Motion to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order" (Dcmt 50-3) has been transferred to this Court by the Southern District of New York pursuant to FRCvP 45(f); and (2) that the parties have conferred in good faith and been unable to resolve their dispute over the length of the deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/12/2015. (cbb)
February 20, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dft Eli Lilly and Company's 34 Motion to Compel. Plf is directed to provide dft with a complete list of her mental health providers from 1/1/1995 to the present and to authorize the release of their records to dft on or before 2/28/2014. Dft shall treat this information and the subsequent records it receives as "Confidential." Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/20/2014. (cbb)
August 14, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Hyung P. Steele for Eli Lilly and Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/13/13. (smj)
July 2, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/2/2013. (cbb)
May 14, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Plf's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Mark Premo-Hopkins for Angela Shoemake. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/14/13. (smj)
April 23, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Andrew E. Kantra for Eli Lilly and Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/22/13. (smj)
April 22, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Nina M. Gussack for Eli Lilly and Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/22/2013. (cbb)
January 28, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Christopher L. Schnieders for Angela Shoemake. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/28/2013. (cbb) Modified on 1/28/2013 (cbb). Regenerated NEF to Christopher L. Schnieders.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoemake v. Eli Lilly & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Shoemake
Represented By: Rebecca C. Blount
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Cartmell
Represented By: Christopher L. Schnieders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?