Mabe v. Whitener et al
Plaintiff: Michael Wayne Mabe
Defendant: Keith Whitener, George Solomon and Ann Dalton
Case Number: 5:2013cv00103
Filed: July 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/13/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(smj)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Reconsideration re 1 Complaint, filed by Michael Wayne Mabe, denying 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Michael Wayne Mabe. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/16/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/15/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabe v. Whitener et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wayne Mabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Whitener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?