Swan Racing Company, LLC v. XXXtreme Motorsport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Swan Racing Company, LLC
Defendant: XXXtreme Motorsport, LLC and Johnathan Cohen
Case Number: 5:2014cv00155
Filed: September 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Iredell
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/23/16. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (smj)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 52 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Swan and Davis shall submit the requested memorandu m on interest and attorney's fees, as well as an affidavit from an independent attorney attesting to the reasonableness of the requested attorney's fees, no later than 10/26/2016. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 10/11/2016. (cbb)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Piken for Johnathan Cohen. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/19/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE on or before the 4/25/16, why counsel's 42 Renewed And Amended Motion To Withdraw should not be allowed. Defendants shall file a response to 38 Joint MOTION to Compel Discovery on or before 5/2/2016. The Clerk shall send this Order to Defendants at the address provided in document no. 42 by certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/7/16. (smj)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM and ORDER that Defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint's Ninth Claim for Relief is hereby DENIED; and Plaintiff's/Third-Party Defendant's concurrent 25 , 26 Motions to Dismiss the Counterclaim/Third Party Complaint's Second and Third Claims for Relief are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/20/2015. (tmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swan Racing Company, LLC v. XXXtreme Motorsport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swan Racing Company, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Link Traynum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XXXtreme Motorsport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?