Pendleton v. Reid et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Pendleton
Defendant: Robert L. Reid, Scott B. Kauffman, Jerry R. Licari, J. Chandler Martin, T. Gray McCaskill, H. Ray McKenney, Jr., John C. Redett, Boyd C. Wilson, Jr., CommunityOne Bancorp and Capital Bank Financial Corp.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00037
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/7/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (nvc)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. This matter will come before the Court for a Final Fairness Hearing on 7/31/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Richard Voorhees. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 5/11/2017. (nvc)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion To Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff ; granting 25 Motion for Approval of Lead Counsel. Pendleton is appointed as Lead Plaintiff. Faruqi Firm and the Ademi Firm are approved and appointed to serve Lead Plaintiff and the Class as Co-Lead Counsel and Ward Black Law is approved to serve the Lead Plaintiff and the Class as Liaison Counsel. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 7/21/16. (smj)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 , 23 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Arthur Luk and John C. Massaro for CommunityOne Bancorp, Scott B. Kauffman, Jerry R. Licari, J. Chandler Martin, T. Gray McCaskill, H. Ray McKenney, Jr., John C. Redett, Robert L. Reid, Boyd C. Wilson, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/5/2016. (tmg)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added S Christopher Szczerban for Capital Bank Financial Corp.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/4/2016. (tmg)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting (15) Motion to Consolidate Cases for Discovery, Trial. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 5:16CV37only. Member Case: 5:16CV45 to be administratively closed; granting (11) Motion to Consolidate Cases for Discovery, Trial. Plf Curtis R. Pendleton appointed Interim Lead Plaintiff. Law firms of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP, and Ademi & O'Reilly, LLP, shall serve as Interim Co-Lead Counsel, law firm of Ward Black Law shall serve as Interim Co-Liaison Counsel, and law firm of Levi & Korsinsky shall serve as additional class counsel. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 3/31/2016. (cbb)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Guri Ademi for Curtis Pendleton; granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James M. Wilson, Jr. for Curtis Pendleton. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/4/16. (smj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendleton v. Reid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Pendleton
Represented By: Guri Ademi
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Represented By: James M. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Reid
Represented By: Andrew R. Hand
Represented By: H. Landis Wade, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott B. Kauffman
Represented By: Andrew R. Hand
Represented By: H. Landis Wade, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry R. Licari
Represented By: Andrew R. Hand
Represented By: H. Landis Wade, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Chandler Martin
Represented By: Andrew R. Hand
Represented By: H. Landis Wade, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Gray McCaskill
Represented By: Andrew R. Hand
Represented By: H. Landis Wade, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ray McKenney, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew R. Hand
Represented By: H. Landis Wade, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Redett
Represented By: Andrew R. Hand
Represented By: H. Landis Wade, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd C. Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew R. Hand
Represented By: H. Landis Wade, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CommunityOne Bancorp
Represented By: Andrew R. Hand
Represented By: H. Landis Wade, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Bank Financial Corp.
Represented By: Ronald Redd Davis
Represented By: Brent Fancher Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?