Dearman v. Collegiate Housing Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Greg Dearman
Defendant: Collegiate Housing Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00057
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion For Equitable Tolling Of Statute OF Limitations. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/7/2018. (nvc)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Certify Class Conditionally as a Collective Action. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/29/2018. (nvc)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew C. Ficzko for Greg Dearman. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/14/17. (tob)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion To Stay Filing Of Certificate Of Initial Attorneys Conference And Joint Rule . Plaintiff shall have up to and including 6/21/2017 to file his motion for Fair Labor Standard Act conditional certification. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties requirement to file their CIAC and Joint Rule 26(f) Report shall be extended until (10) days after the Court issues a ruling on the issue of conditional certification Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/8/2017. (nvc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dearman v. Collegiate Housing Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Dearman
Represented By: Philip Joseph Gibbons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collegiate Housing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?